Duggal, Vikas (CPSO#: 76271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute Mental Health
P.O.Box 5777, Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Duggal ( CPSO# 76271 )

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Business Address:
Suite F
1553 Dundas Street
London ON  N5W 5Y5
Phone Number: (519) 642-3335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIKAS DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006