Duggan, Peter Raymond (CPSO#: 70758)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 1996 to 30 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 1996 to 04 Oct 1996
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 1996