Duhaime, Benoit (CPSO#: 95632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013