Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Duic, Andrija (CPSO#: 22963)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, German, Italian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2012