Duic, Marko (CPSO#: 50470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket, Ontario
L3Y 2P9
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895 4521 Ext. 6619
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 530 6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MDM Duic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Duic ( CPSO# 50470 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6003

Business Address:
2/634 West Level 2
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKO DUIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1983