Dukelow, Adam Michael (CPSO#: 77542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dukelow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dukelow ( CPSO# 77542 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM MICHAEL DUKELOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKELOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007