Dukhovny, Stanislav (CPSO#: 95698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: (289) 371-3399
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dukhovny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dukhovny ( CPSO# 95698 )

Business Address:
Suite 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Phone Number: (289) 371-3500

Business Address:
2 Bloor Street West
Suite 1912
Toronto ON  M4W 3E2
Phone Number: (888) 408-9178

Business Address:
505 Consumers Road
Suite 901
North York ON  M2J 4V8
Phone Number: (647) 931-9586

Business Address:
1118 Centre Street
Suite 19
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R9
Phone Number: (905) 479-9902

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAV DUKHOVNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKHOVNY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013