Dukic, Helena (CPSO#: 87885)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Ext. 525
Fax: (905) 579-5548
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helena Dukic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Dukic ( CPSO# 87885 )

Business Address:
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELENA DUKIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUKIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010