Dullege, Suzanne Marie (CPSO#: 88594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Hastings Family Team Madoc
Tri-Area Medical Centre
52 St Lawrence Street
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone: (613) 473-4134
Fax: (613) 473-4740
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Dullege Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dullege ( CPSO# 88594 )

Business Address:
Central Hastings Family Team Madoc
Tri-Area Medical Centre
52 St. Lawrence Street
Madoc ON  K0K 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 473-0801

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARIE DULLEGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DULLEGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011