Dumais, Rejean (CPSO#: 61595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002