Dumais, Robert Charles (CPSO#: 69891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 675-4733
Fax: (705) 671-5458
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Dumais Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dumais ( CPSO# 69891 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
North Bay Regional Health Centre - Kirkwood Place Sudbury
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHARLES DUMAIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998