Dumas, Michel Denis Joseph (CPSO#: 62226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Abilene Radiology Associates
P O Box 119
Abilene TX  79604
United States
Phone: (325) 672-0920

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHEL DENIS JOSEPH DUMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUMAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991