Dumlao, Linda Abrina (CPSO#: 41974)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ilocano, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001