Dunbar-Yaffe, Richard James (CPSO#: 98301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Eaton Building 14 EN 206
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416)-340-3155
Fax: 416-595-5826
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAMES DUNBAR-YAFFE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNBAR-YAFFE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016