Duncan, Eric George (CPSO#: 55057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Bristol, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 607-0005
Fax: (905) 607-0341
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC GEORGE DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1986