Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Duncan, Graeme Stephen (CPSO#: 66390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 15 to 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 681-6341
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Stephen Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )

Business Address:
3305 Harvester Road
Units 15 - 20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007


Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME STEPHEN DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995