Duncan, Jacqueline Mary De Lourdes (CPSO#: 61654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
604 Champlain Road
Tiny ON  L9M 0C2
Phone: (705) 549-8346
Fax: (705) 526-2462
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Duncan ( CPSO# 61654 )

Business Address:
604 Champlain Road
Tiny ON  L9M 0C2
Phone Number: (705) 549-8346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE MARY DE LOURDES DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1992