Duncan, Peter Gordon (CPSO#: 24488)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1999