Duncan, Walter James (CPSO#: 30960)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1998