Dundas, Robert Bruce (CPSO#: 29748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993