Dundas, Susan Doris (CPSO#: 55369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hinck's Dellcrest Centre
440 Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2H4
Phone: (416) 924-1164
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan Dundas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dundas ( CPSO# 55369 )

Business Address:
Hinck's Dellcrest Centre
440 Jarvis Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2H4
Phone Number: (416) 857-0307

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN DORIS DUNDAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNDAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986