Dunlop, Peter Ewart (CPSO#: 19423)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for a copy of their medical record should contact: The Medical Records Department Haldimand War Memorial Hospital 206 John Street Dunnville, ON N1A 2P7
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012


Address: All other patients should contact the following: Joan Grant Office Manager Medical Arts Building 334 Broad Street West Dunnville, ON N1A 1T1 Tel: 905-774-7541
Instructions: Former patients of Dr. Dunlop who were under the care of Dr. Blake should contact Dr. Blake (#71529) to get a copy of their records.
Date Received: 10 Oct 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012