Dunn, James Michael (CPSO#: 21626)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 12 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Sep 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Jan 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 1988
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 28 Feb 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Jan 1998