Dunn, Jeremy (CPSO#: 92453)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2010 to 28 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2010 to 29 Mar 2010
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2010