Dunn, Michael Stephen (CPSO#: 31456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 87777
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Dunn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dunn ( CPSO# 31456 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4-222
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN DUNN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Sep 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985