Dunne, Daniel Patrick (CPSO#: 70678)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1998