Dunne, Shelly Marie (CPSO#: 66888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301 - 20 Wynford Drive
Don Mills ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 441-3522
Fax: (416) 441-0175
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLY MARIE DUNNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997