Dunsmuir, James Thomas Moonlight (CPSO#: 56938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dunsmuir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dunsmuir ( CPSO# 56938 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES THOMAS MOONLIGHT DUNSMUIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNSMUIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1987