Dunwoody, James Moore (CPSO#: 63697)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 106 3825 Sunset Street Burnaby, BC V5G 1T4
Date Received: 01 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015