Duong, Dung Ngoc (CPSO#: 71662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: (905) 553-9006
Fax: (905) 553-9002
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dung Ngoc Duong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Duong ( CPSO# 71662 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 553-9006

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNG NGOC DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999