Dupuis, Jean-Eric Joseph (CPSO#: 68243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Moose Creek Medical Centre
P O Box 40
66 Sabourin Street
Moose Creek ON  K0C 1W0
Phone: (613) 538-2710 Ext. 5
Fax: (613) 538-2258
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean-Eric Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dupuis ( CPSO# 68243 )

Business Address:
Moose Creek Medical Centre
P O Box 40
66 Sabourin Street
Moose Creek ON  K0C 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 538-2710

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-ERIC JOSEPH DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1996