Dupuis, Jean-Yves (CPSO#: 61318)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bislama, English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart Inst.
Department of Anesthesia
Room H-2410
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7381
Fax: (613) 696-7099
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-YVES DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 1992