Dupuis, Paul (CPSO#: 60169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: Dupuis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 768-3646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL DUPUIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUPUIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988