Durant, Dean Christopher Dalton (CPSO#: 81404)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Imaging and Ultrasound
3rd Avenue Belleville
Bridgetown BB11114
Barbados
Phone: 246-426-2750
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dean Christopher Dalton Durant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 12 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Barbados

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEAN CHRISTOPHER DALTON DURANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 29 Aug 2004
PEAP - Resident - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010