Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Durepos, Christian Pierre (CPSO#: 65100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone: (705) 267-5600
Fax: (705) 268-7244
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christian P. Durepos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durepos ( CPSO# 65100 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone Number: (705) 267-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTIAN PIERRE DUREPOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUREPOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993