Durie, Peter Roy (CPSO#: 31981)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014