Durrant, Timothy John (CPSO#: 59528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 5614
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007


Corporation Name: Durrant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Durrant ( CPSO# 59528 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN DURRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURRANT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989