Durward, Quentin John (CPSO#: 50570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CNOS, PC
575 Sioux Point Road
Dakota Dunes SD  57049
United States
Phone: (605) 217-2667
Fax: (605) 217-2900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Hawaii
USA - Iowa
USA - Nebraska
USA - South Dakota

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 02 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUENTIN JOHN DURWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURWARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1983