Dushenski, David Gary (CPSO#: 65294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 3013
Fax: (416) 586-4719
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Dushenski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dushenski ( CPSO# 65294 )

Business Address:
Emergency Department
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GARY DUSHENSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUSHENSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993