Dutchak, Peter Anthony (CPSO#: 90389)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 2, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Anthony
            Dutchak, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dutchak to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Dutchak has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.