Dutil, Maha (CPSO#: 50684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Names: Haroun, Maha (used until: 18 Oct 2006 )     Haroun, Maha (used until: 04 Feb 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maha Dutil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dutil ( CPSO# 50684 )

Business Address:
807 Broadview Avenue
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA DUTIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1985