Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Dutkiewicz-Stvrtecky, Janina (CPSO#: 50568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Dutkiewicz-Stvrtecky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dutkiewicz-Stvrtecky ( CPSO# 50568 )

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINA DUTKIEWICZ-STVRTECKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTKIEWICZ-STVRTECKY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1984