Dutly, Andre Emanuel (CPSO#: 78641)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Zurich, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005