Dutta, Sidharth (CPSO#: 94645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Russian

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone: (905) 793-3311
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14
Lisa street
Brampton ON  L6T 4W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-2751
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Dutta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dutta ( CPSO# 94645 )

Business Address:
Suite 16
2120 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-0100

Business Address:
Suite 107
10095 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6R 0K1
Phone Number: (905) 793-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Feb 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIDHARTH DUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013