Dutton, Heidi Pauline (CPSO#: 92932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
4th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEIDI PAULINE DUTTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2015