Dutz, Jan Peter (CPSO#: 52839)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 05 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Oct 1997