Duval, Nicolas (CPSO#: 61458)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 2000