Dvirnik, Nazari (CPSO#: 100323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 44453
Electoral District: 04

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Practice Within the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (1)   Dr.   Nazari   Dvirnik   shall  practise  medicine  as  required  by  the
                  postgraduate medical education  program  in which Dr. Dvirnik is enrolled
                  at McMaster University.

            (2)   In Dr. Dvirnik's practice in the postgraduate  medical education program,
                  Dr. Dvirnik shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated  with the department
                  where   Dr.  Dvirnik  is  properly  practising  medicine  and  to   which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education.

            (3)   In Dr. Dvirnik's  practice in the postgraduate medical education program,
                  Dr. Dvirnik shall not charge a fee for medical services.

            Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (4)   Dr. Dvirnik may practise  medicine  in the intensive care unit and to the
                  extent  of  his  employment  at  Hamilton   Health  Sciences  Corporation
                  Hamilton, while under supervision coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College.

            (5)   In Dr. Dvirnik's practice specified in paragraph (4), Dr. Dvirnik may not
                  charge a fee for medical services.

            Expiry of Certificate

            (6)   This certificate of registration expires, and Dr.  Dvirnik must thereupon
                  cease all practice both in and outside the postgraduate medical education
                  program, on the earlier of the following times:

                  (a)   when Dr. Dvirnik is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate
                        medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or
                  
                  (b)   when  Dr.  Dvirnik no longer holds Canadian citizenship,  permanent
                        resident status,  or  a  valid  employment  authorization under the
                        Immigration Act (Canada).
                  
            Termination of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (7)   This  certificate  automatically  converts  to  a  regular   Postgraduate
                  Education  certificate  and  Dr.   Dvirnik  must  immediately  cease  all
                  practice outside the postgraduate medical education program if any one of
                  the following occurs:

                  (a)   the supervisor identified in paragraph (4) notifies the College  of
                        any  concerns  regarding  Dr. Dvirnik's practice, including but not
                        limited  to  concerns  regarding   knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or
                        attitude;
                  
                  (b)   the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Dvirnik's practice;
                  
                  (c)   the Postgraduate Dean informs the College that the medical school's
                        approval  for  Dr.   Dvirnik  to engage  in  practice  outside  the
                        postgraduate medical education program has been withdrawn;
                  
                  (d)   when Dr. Dvirnik's employment as specified in paragraph (4) ceases;
                        or
                  
                  (e)   if Dr. Dvirnik takes a leave of  absence,  or  transfers to another
                        program,  from  the  postgraduate  education program  specified  in
                        paragraph (1).
                  
            Resumption of Practice Outside the Postgraduate Medical Education Program

            (8)   In   the  event  of  conversion  to  a  regular  Postgraduate   Education
                  certificate  under  paragraph  (7)  or  expiry  of  the certificate under
                  paragraph  (7),  Dr.  Dvirnik  may  not resume any practice  outside  the
                  postgraduate medical education program  under the restricted registration
                  for residents policy until Dr. Dvirnik applies  for  a new certificate of
                  registration and obtains approval by the Registration Committee.



            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  November 3, 2016.  In accordance  with
                  paragraph 6(a), this certificate of  registration  expires  on  June  30,
                  2018.  All practice must cease on that date.

                  Practice   outside   the  postgraduate  medical  education  program  must
                  immediately cease upon any of the events in paragraph 7.