Dvorkin, Gary Steven (CPSO#: 43781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1111 ghyslain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Dvorkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dvorkin ( CPSO# 43781 )

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY STEVEN DVORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVORKIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1992