Dwara, Iyad (CPSO#: 76853)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Los Andes, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 May 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2003